Hamilton v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. et al
Plaintiff: Arthur C. Hamilton
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A., Old Republic Default Management Services and Shirley Franklin
Case Number: 5:2019cv03722
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman all further proceedings RE [14) Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Shirley Franklin. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Old Republic Default Management Services. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A.. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/8/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #5 Motion for Permission for Pacer Fee Waiver.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #4 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Pacer Fee Waiver filed by Arthur C. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Arthur C. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arthur C. Hamilton. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arthur C. Hamilton. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shirley Franklin, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A., Old Republic Default Management Services. Filed by Arthur C. Hamilton. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur C. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Default Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?