Harner v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Carol Rae Harner
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv03826
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davilafor all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case,. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT [L.R. 6-1] BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carol Rae Harner (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carol Rae Harner.. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13484851.). Filed byCarol Rae Harner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harner v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rae Harner
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?