Arnold v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Arnold and Marie A Arnold
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc and MetLife Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03920
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Time To Respond To Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lam, Judy) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marie A Arnold.. (Arnold, Marie) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Lam, Judy) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie A Arnold. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Arnold, Marie) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SEE DOCKET 9***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie A Arnold. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff returned summons)(Arnold, Marie) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Marie Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Marie Arnold (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet mailed with filing Documents JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/16). Clerk is mailing cor rect Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 06/17) for Plaintiff to complete and mail back to the court. Self-address Envelope enclosed for her convenience. Document to be re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Re: #1 .1]. Complaint, filed by Marie Arnold (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Negligence, Negligence Misrepresented Invading privacy against All Defendants (Filing fee of $ 400 Paid, Receipt No. 54611018131). Filed by Marie Arnold. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie A Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc
Represented By: Judy Man-Ling Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?