Transaction Secure, LLC v. GitHub, Inc.
Plaintiff: Transaction Secure, LLC
Defendant: GitHub, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04050
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent - C19-4052 JCS, C19-4075 TSH, C19-4355 DMR. by Transaction Secure, LLC (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/16/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Luis Uriarte for GitHub, Inc. (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bas de Blank for GitHub, Inc. (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement S. Roberts for GitHub, Inc. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GitHub, Inc... (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by GitHub, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corp. for GitHub, Inc.. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Bobrow on Behalf of GitHub, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Transaction Secure, LLC. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Transaction Secure, LLC. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Transaction Secure, LLC. Service waived by GitHub, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to GitHub, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transaction Secure, LLC.. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transaction Secure, LLC. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Transaction Secure, LLC . (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against GitHub, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13519602). Filed by Transaction Secure, LLC. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transaction Secure, LLC v. GitHub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transaction Secure, LLC
Represented By: Coleman Washington Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GitHub, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Bobrow
Represented By: Bas de Blank
Represented By: Robert Luis Uriarte
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?