General Insurance Company of America v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04092
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com Services, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Schmaeling, Daniel) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Schmaeling, Daniel) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13526852.). Filed byGeneral Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmaeling, Daniel) (Filed on 7/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Insurance Company of America v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Schmaeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?