Robinson v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Dayrin Robinson
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 5:2019cv04216
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: PSLC MBI
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 2nd attempt at mailing blank complaint; magistrate consent; IFP blank; certificate of funds blank form & docket sheet. First mailing was refused. (lmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Mail sent to Dayrin Robinson returned as undeliverable (Refused) re #1 Complaint, #3 Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form, #4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge, #2 Clerk's Notice re: IFP. Mail Returned; response required by 10/15/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 8/30/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown. Filed by Dayrin Robinson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayrin Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?