Lyons v. Dolls Kill, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah M. Lyons
Defendant: Dolls Kills, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04573
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarah M. Lyons. Service waived by Dolls Kills, Inc. waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah M. Lyons.. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Refund Status re #8 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26JBICVK by Sarah M. Lyons. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Refund Status re #3 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dolls Kills, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2019. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26JBICVK by sara M lyons. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dolls Kill Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13588600.). Filed bysara M lyons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/7/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Dolls Kill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M. Lyons
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolls Kills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?