Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Defendant: Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04742
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order granting #18 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1659. The parties shall file status reports every six months. The Clerk shall administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1659 filed by Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tung, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 16, 2019 **Terminated 12/4/2019 Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Lucy H. Koh per case reassignment to Judge Edward J. Davila. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re Related Case Order. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *** (typographical)ERROR *** please see #15 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16cv5251 EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for December 4, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velodyne Lidar, Inc... (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Young (Young, Patricia) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and L.R. 3-15 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Velodyne Lidar, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate Baidu, Inc. for Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13606988.). Filed by Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Patricia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Yeh-Kai Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?