Divino Group LLC et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: BriaAndChrissy LLC, Brett Somers, Divino Group LLC, Chase Ross, Celso Dulay, Chrissy Chambers, Chris Knight, Bria Kam, Lindsay Amer and Cameron Stiehl
Defendant: YouTube, LLC and Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04749
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lindsay Amer, BriaAndChrissy LLC, Chrissy Chambers, Divino Group LLC, Celso Dulay, Bria Kam, Chris Knight, Chase Ross, Brett Somers, Cameron Stiehl.. (Ramos, Debi) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint for Damages, Injunctive Relief, Restitution, and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13607944.). Filed byBria Kam, Celso Dulay, Chrissy Chambers, Brett Somers, Chris Knight, Chase Ross, Cameron Stiehl, Divino Group LLC, Lindsay Amer, BriaAndChrissy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Obstler, Peter) (Filed on 8/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Divino Group LLC et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BriaAndChrissy LLC
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Somers
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Divino Group LLC
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Ross
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Dulay
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissy Chambers
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Knight
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bria Kam
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Amer
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Stiehl
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Debi Ann Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?