Corephotonics, Ltd. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Corephotonics, Ltd.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04809
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines/Hearings per #16 Order: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re [104) Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 7, 2019. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 11/4/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time for Apple Inc. to Respond to re #1 Complaint, filed by Apple Inc., Corephotonics Ltd. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Corephotonics, Ltd... (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related documents served on Apple Inc. on 8/19/2019, filed by Corephotonics, Ltd.. (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Corephotonics, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (L.R. 3-15(b)) AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1) (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures Statement by Corephotonics, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Corephotonics, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13611884.). Filed by Corephotonics, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons) (Fenster, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corephotonics, Ltd. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corephotonics, Ltd.
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Benjamin T. Wang
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?