WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. et al

Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.
Defendant: STREAMRAY INC., FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Does 1-20
Not Yet Classified: PHV FRANK M. GASPARO and PHV RALPH A. DENGLER
Case Number: 5:2019cv05036
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 174 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 173 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:14-cv-03456. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Case extracted via CM/ECF to the USDC Northern District of California. (th, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (124 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, (158 in 2:14-cv-03456-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, (175 in 2:14-cv-02340-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, etc. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (byl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 171 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (byl)
March 28, 2019 Filing 170 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #169 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER directing parties to submit to the Court a joint status report that sets forth: incomplete discovery in each case and proposed deadlines by March 28, 2019; and scheduling a telephone conference on April 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/14/2019. (byl)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER granting #166 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (ys, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER granting #165 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (ys, )
December 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #166 MOTION to Seal Document. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION to Seal Document #158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
December 12, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #165 MOTION to Seal Document. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Seal Document #164 Response (NOT Motion),, #159 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Objections to Report & Recommendation, #3 Redacted Response to Objections, #4 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
November 28, 2018 Filing 164 RESPONSE re #159 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #162 MOTION to Seal Document #158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 179 Motion to Seal, 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 2:14-cv-2340-ES-MAH, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.; Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than December 14, 2018, etc. re #162 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/26/2018. (dam, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION to Seal Document #158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Version of Document to Be Sealed, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER ORDER Granting #160 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re: #159 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/20/2018. (JB, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 160 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re #159 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 159 OBJECTION to #158 Report and Recommendations by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 22, 2018 Filing 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (ld, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 LETTER ORDER terminating Defendants' #146 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, or alternatively, to dismiss for improper venue, or to transfer, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/29/2018. (sm)
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument Conference held on 3/28/2018. (ECR) (jqb, )
March 21, 2018 Filing 156 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (jqb, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #153 Motion to Seal Document #147 Brief, #150 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #149 Brief in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/18. (DD, )
January 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #153 MOTION to Seal Document #147 Brief,,,, #150 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #149 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 16, 2018 Filing 153 MOTION to Seal Document #147 Brief,,,, #150 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #149 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Opposition to Motion, #5 Proposed Redactions to Reply Brief in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 11 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #9 Exhibit 14 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #10 Exhibit 16 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #11 Exhibit 17 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #12 Exhibit 18 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #13 Exhibit 20 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #14 Exhibit 21 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #15 Exhibit 22 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #16 Exhibit 23 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #17 Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #19 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting Pltf's letter request for a one-week extension of time, to 1/16/18, to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/18. (DD, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 151 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 26, 2017 Filing 150 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. re #146 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 19, 2017 Filing 149 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #146 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. re #147 Brief,,,, #146 MOTION to Dismiss (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 147 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF NO. 146] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 22, 2017 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ezra Shashoua, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that the pending motions to dismiss or transfer under 1406(a) is terminated without prejudice, as follows: WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Multi-Media, LLC, Civil Action No. 14-2340 (ES), D.E. 153; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Data Conversions, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-2345 (ES), D.E. 140; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Flying Crocodile, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-2674 (ES), D.E. 131; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Gattyn Group S..r.l., Civil Action No. 14-2832 (ES), D.E. 140; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Friendfinder Networks, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-3456 (ES), D.E. 138; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Vubeology, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-4531 (ES), D.E. 116; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Webpower, Inc., Civil Action No. 15-3581 (ES), D.E. 104; that Defendants shall make any motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter, and to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under 1406(a) on or before November 22, 2017; any opposition shall be filed by December 19, 2017; any reply shall be filed by December 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/2/17. (DD, )
September 26, 2017 Filing 144 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 29, 2017 Filing 143 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. re #138 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 23, 2017 Filing 142 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Statement, #2 Exhibit A and B)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 22, 2017 Filing 141 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #138 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mord M. Lewis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting parties request for an extension of Claim Construction deadlines, as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/17. (DD, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 139 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess regarding Joint Request for Extension of Claim Construction Deadlines. (JAFFESS, ARI)
July 31, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #138 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
July 28, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2), #6 Declaration of Ezra Shashoua, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 137 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #61 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 12, 2017 Filing 136 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER ORDER Granting #133 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/2017. (JB, )
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal is hereby granted, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/2017. (JB, )
June 30, 2017 Filing 133 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting Deft's Letter Request for a three-week extension of all claim construction deadlines, as set forth in the chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/17. (DD, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 131 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting re #128 Letter Request for pro hac vice admission as to ALEX PATCHEN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/12/17. (DD, )
June 12, 2017 Filing 129 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising dispute regarding TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands (May 22, 2017). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 8, 2017 Filing 128 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Declaration of Alex G. Patchen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
June 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #127 MOTION to Seal Document #126 Letter,,, . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
June 7, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to Seal Document #126 Letter,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of David G. Liston, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted May 24, 2017 Letter, #4 Redacted Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer to May 24, 2017 Letter, #5 Appendix 1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #6 Appendix 2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #7 A1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #8 A2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #9 Redacted A3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Redacted A4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #11 Redacted A5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #12 Redacted A6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #13 A7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #14 A8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #15 Redacted A9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #16 A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #17 Redacted A11 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #18 Exhibit D1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit D2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #20 Exhibit D3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #21 Redacted Ex. D4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #22 Redacted Ex. D5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #23 Redacted Ex. D6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #24 Redacted Ex. D7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #25 Exhibit D8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #26 Exhibit D9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #27 Exhibit D10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #28 Redacted Ex A (WAG), #29 Exhibit B (WAG), #30 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
May 24, 2017 Filing 126 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 A1, #5 A2, #6 A3, #7 A4, #8 A5, #9 A6, #10 A7, #11 A8, #12 A9, #13 A10, #14 A11, #15 Exhibit D1, #16 Exhibit D2, #17 Exhibit D3, #18 Exhibit D4, #19 Exhibit D5, #20 Exhibit D6, #21 Exhibit D7, #22 Exhibit D8, #23 Exhibit D9, #24 Exhibit D10, #25 Exhibit A (WAG), #26 Exhibit B (WAG))(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER FOR AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/18/17. (DD, )
May 16, 2017 Filing 124 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing a proposed Amended Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
April 5, 2017 Filing 123 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Joint Letter Motion re: Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/30/17. (DD, )
March 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #121 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 121 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs proposed Amended Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
March 24, 2017 Filing 120 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2017 is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2017. (jqb, )
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #111 Motion to Seal Document #104 Letter,, #109 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/4/17. (DD, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER/LETTER OF REQUEST for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the 3/18/70 Hague Convention on the taking of evidence abroad in civil or commercial matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (DD, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 116 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #113 Exhibit (to Document),, #111 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #104 Letter,, #109 Letter,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 8, 2016 Filing 115 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #114 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 8, 2016 Filing 114 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 7, 2016 Filing 113 Exhibit to #112 Letter by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC.. (QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 7, 2016 Filing 112 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 110 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #111 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #104 Letter,, #109 Letter,, . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 29, 2016 Filing 111 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #104 Letter,, #109 Letter,, by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted November 3, 2016 Letter of Defendants, #4 Redacted Ex. A to November 3, 2016 Letter, #5 Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff, #6 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to continue to meet and confer regarding Defendants' request that their Letter of Request be signed. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter on their own, they shall appear in the courtroom of the Undersigned on December 8, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. for an in person meet and confer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/16. (TAD)
November 21, 2016 Filing 109 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #104 Letter,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 15, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by MORD MICHAEL LEWIS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LEWIS, MORD)
November 15, 2016 Filing 107 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #106 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 14, 2016 Filing 106 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess re #105 Letter, #104 Letter,,. (JAFFESS, ARI)
November 14, 2016 Filing 105 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #104 Letter,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 3, 2016 Filing 104 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 25, 2016 Filing 103 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2016., Fact Discovery due by 4/21/2017.); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (DD, )
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that Defendants' request that the Court limit the number of claims that Plaintiff can assert is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's request that the Court limit the number of prior art references by Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 100 Joint Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
October 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. (ECR) (jqb, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/30/2016. (jqb, )
September 29, 2016 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record re #73 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. See order #98 . (jqb, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion to Bifurcate; that liability and damages discovery is bifurcated; that liability and damages discovery is bifurcated; that damages discovery is stayed pending the completion of liability discovery and dispositive-motion practice, except that the parties are direct to proceed with any discovery under the Hague Convention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/16. (DD, )
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is cancelled. A new date and time for the call will be scheduled shortly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/16. (TAD)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is adjourned to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/29/16. (TAD)
July 28, 2016 Filing 94 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
July 27, 2016 Filing 97 Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 15, 2016, before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2016. (mfr)
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2016 re #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery filed by STREAMRAY INC., FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. Decision Reserved. (jqb, )
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall forthwith continue to meet & confer in an attempt to resolve the issue raised in their June 23, 2016 letter to the Court. There will be a telephone conference call with counsel on July 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. to advise the Court regarding the status of their meet & confer and this outstanding issue. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/16. (TAD)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' June 23, 2016 joint letter, the Court adjourns Plaintiff's June 23, 2016 deadline to submit responses to Defendants invalidity contentions and the July 6, 2016 deadline to exchange proposed terms of construction. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the positions and arguments raised in the June 23, 2016 joint letter before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on July 15, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/5/2016. (ps, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 91 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER: There will be Oral Argument on the pending motion to bifurcate #73 on July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/25/16. (TAD)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/28/16. (DD, )
March 23, 2016 Filing 88 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ).
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (ECR) (jqb, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 86 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Pltf., WAG's re #82 Letter Request to file sur-reply in further opposition to Defts' Joint Motion to Bifurcate Liability & Damages Disc. not to exceed five (5) pgs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (DD, )
March 3, 2016 Filing 83 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #82 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 3, 2016 Filing 82 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 29, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. re #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/25/2016. (jqb, )
February 23, 2016 Filing 79 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 74 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 22, 2016 Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 18, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting re #75 Letter Request for an extension until 2/23/16 to comply w/Text Order to allow the parties to continue to meet & confer in a good-faith attempt to resolve the remaining disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/17/16. (DD, )
February 16, 2016 Filing 75 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER:The Court has reviewed the parties' February 5, 2016 letter presenting disputes between the parties regarding the form of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. The Court directs the parties to immediately resume their efforts to meet and confer on this dispute. If the parties cannot resolve their issues, then they shall submit, by February 17, 2016, a revised letter presenting any remaining disputes. The revised joint letter also shall explain why the Court's standard Discovery Confidentiality Order (Appendix S to the New Jersey Federal Practice Rules) is insufficient. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/16/16. (Dunican, T)
February 16, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. Motion set for 3/7/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 8, 2016 Filing 72 Transcript of Proceedings of Scheduling Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ek)
February 5, 2016 Filing 71 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re: Discovery Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/16. (DD, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 69 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER purs. to Fed.R.Evid.502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (DD, )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re: E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (DD, )
January 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2016. (ECR) (jqb, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 66 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing Joint Discovery Plan, E-Discovery Order, and Rule 502(d) Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order re: Electronic Discovery, #3 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 22, 2015 Filing 65 ANSWER to Counterclaim by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 1, 2015 Reset Hearing: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2016 has been adjourned to 1/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
November 30, 2015 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 has been adjourned to 1/21/2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
November 30, 2015 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #64 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/24/15. (DD, )
November 25, 2015 Filing 64 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to WAG Acquisition, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 17, 2015 Filing 63 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG re #62 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 16, 2015 Filing 62 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #60 Order, Set/Clear Flags, Set Hearings, #59 Letter,. (MILLER, KEITH)
November 16, 2015 Filing 61 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC..(MILLER, KEITH)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/2015. (jqb, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 59 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-PTAB Decision on 011 Patent, #2 Exhibit EX 2-PTAB Decision on 141 Patent, #3 Exhibit EX 3-PTAB Decision on 611 Patent, #4 Exhibit EX 4-PTAB Decision on 839 Patent)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 5, 2015 Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. (jr)
October 26, 2015 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC..(MILLER, KEITH)
September 25, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #57 Order submitted by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/15. (DD, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Defts. to answer Cmp. until 10/26/15. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/24/15. (DD, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 56 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION/ORDER denying #42 MOTION to Dismiss; that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate WebPowers motion to dismiss in Civil Action No. 15-3581, D.E. No. 9.; that the parties shall engage in limited jurisdictional discovery regarding the Courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant Coolvision.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/10/15. (DD, )
July 29, 2015 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2015 re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) filed by STREAMRAY INC., FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Lynne Johnson.) (ps, )
June 11, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. of withdrawal of appearance (MILLER, KEITH)
June 9, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (JAFFESS, ARI)
May 28, 2015 Set Hearings: Please be advised that Oral Argument for the pending Motion to Dismiss has been scheduled for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, )
May 19, 2015 Filing 51 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff re #50 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IV v. Capital One)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
May 18, 2015 Filing 50 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing Supplemental Authority re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MILLER, KEITH)
April 15, 2015 Filing 49 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. re #48 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
April 15, 2015 Filing 48 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (MILLER, KEITH)
April 8, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 24, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (MILLER, KEITH)
March 20, 2015 Filing 45 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LEDA DUNN WETTRE terminated. (MILLER, KEITH)
January 13, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). Motion set for 2/17/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
January 12, 2015 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Defendants' Joint Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints) (MILLER, KEITH)
January 12, 2015 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Abramson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Abramson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Abramson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Abramson Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Abramson Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Abramson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Abramson Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Abramson Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Abramson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Abramson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Abramson Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Abramson Declaration, #14 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
January 12, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Leonid Radvinsky, #3 Declaration of Noam Fogel, #4 Declaration of Michael A. Innes, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1 to Innes Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Innes Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Innes Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Innes Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Innes Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 to Innes Declaration, #11 Exhibit 7 to Innes Declaration, #12 Exhibit 8 to Innes Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: parties' briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/8/14. (sr, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 40 Letter from All Counsel to Judge Salas Regarding Briefing of Motions To Dismiss. (WETTRE, LEDA)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER consolidating the WAG actions for discovery purposes only & adjourn the Scheduling Cnf. set for November 5, 2014 to a date following a decision on the joint motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/6/14. (DD, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2014. (ps, )
September 24, 2014 Reset Hearings: Please be advised that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 has been RESCHEDULED to 11/5/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Esther Salas. A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 9/29/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. Plaintiffs counsel shall coordinate the call. (ps, )
September 23, 2014 Filing 37 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re #36 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 23, 2014 Filing 36 Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Salas. (WETTRE, LEDA)
September 23, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by JILLIAN ALEXANDRIA CENTANNI on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (CENTANNI, JILLIAN)
September 22, 2014 Filing 34 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re Proposed Order re 31 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 22, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/20/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Steamray Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Andrew P. MacArthur In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1 to MacArthur Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to MacArthur Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to MacArthur Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to MacArthur Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER withdrawing #20 Motion to Dismiss and allowing defts. to present all their arguments in a new Motion to Dismiss to be fld. by 9/19/14. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/17/14. (DD, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER. In response to docket entries 23 and 24, the Court requests that the parties provide a joint proposed order on the issues therein by no later than the close of business on Monday, September 22nd. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/16/2014. (ps, )
September 16, 2014 Filing 30 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re #29 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 16, 2014 Filing 29 Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (WETTRE, LEDA)
September 15, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. MACARTHUR on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (MACARTHUR, ANDREW)
September 9, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. STREAMRAY INC. served on 6/3/2014, answer due 7/8/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 9, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. served on 6/3/2014, answer due 7/8/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER. The request to postpone the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 before Judge Esther Salas is hereby denied. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/4/2014. (ps, )
September 3, 2014 Filing 24 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. re #23 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
August 29, 2014 Filing 23 Letter from Leda Wettre to Judge Salas requesting adjournment of initial conference. (WETTRE, LEDA)
August 29, 2014 Filing 22 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER-ORDER dismissing as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/25/14. (DD, )
August 25, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 9/15/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Steamray Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA)
August 21, 2014 Pro Hac Vice counsel, FRANK M. GASPARO and RALPH A. DENGLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ralph A. Dengler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WETTRE, LEDA)
August 21, 2014 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Frank M. Gasparo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WETTRE, LEDA)
August 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to FRANK GASPARO, ESQ. & RALPH DENGLER, ESQ.: $ 300., receipt number NEW021046 (DD, )
August 18, 2014 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/15/2014. (ps, )
August 12, 2014 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #16 Stipulation and Order submitted by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/22/14. (DD, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME for defts., FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Streamray Inc. to answer First Amended Cmp. until 8/22/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/11/14. (DD, )
August 8, 2014 Filing 15 Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Dickson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to FRANK M. GASPARO, ESQ. & RALPH A. DENGLER, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/4/14. (DD, )
July 29, 2014 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Streamray Inc. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
July 29, 2014 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
July 18, 2014 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
July 9, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/4/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 8, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. Responses due by 7/21/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Steamray Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA)
July 8, 2014 Filing 9 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. and Ralph A. Dengler, Esq. for by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA)
July 2, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD MATTHEW NOSHER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (NOSHER, TODD)
June 24, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. MILLER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (MILLER, KEITH)
June 24, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/8/14. (DD, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Streamray Inc... (WETTRE, LEDA)
June 2, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, )
May 30, 2014 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, )
May 30, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, )
May 30, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5720815) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Ntc, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHV FRANK M. GASPARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHV RALPH A. DENGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STREAMRAY INC.
Represented By: ANDREW P. MACARTHUR
Represented By: Jillian Alexandria Centanni
Represented By: LEDA DUNN WETTRE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Represented By: Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: TODD MATTHEW NOSHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FriendFinder Networks Inc.
Represented By: ANDREW P. MACARTHUR
Represented By: Jillian Alexandria Centanni
Represented By: LEDA DUNN WETTRE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Represented By: Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: TODD MATTHEW NOSHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: DAVID G. LISTON
Represented By: MORD MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: ARI JASON JAFFESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?