United States of America v. Various Firearms
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Various Firearms
Case Number: 5:2019cv05199
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re #19 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate e Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASES 19cv5199 NC, 19cr187 EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/3/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 09/27/2019. (Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:19-cr-00187 EJD and 5:19-cv-05199 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/23/2019. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #5 Proposed Warrant, #13 Proposed Warrant, #14 Proposed Warrant, #11 Proposed Warrant, #10 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint, #6 Proposed Warrant, #8 Proposed Warrant, #3 Notice (Other), #9 Proposed Warrant, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #12 Proposed Warrant, #7 Proposed Warrant, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America (Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem) against Various Firearms.( (No Process) Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Various Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen D. Beausey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?