Malolot v. Cypress Professional Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gerry Malolot
Defendant: Cypress Professional Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05232
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cypress Professional Services, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Summons Returned Executed fil ed by Gerry Malolot (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerry Malolot.. (Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerry Malolot. (Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. The Civil Cover Sheet was recently revised. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19).< /b< Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings < Other Documents < Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cypress Professional Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13635526.). Filed byGerry Malolot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malolot v. Cypress Professional Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Malolot
Represented By: Jonathan A Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Professional Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?