Vasquez Cruz v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Ricardo A. Vasquez Cruz
Respondent: Richard Valeika, Kevin McAleenan, Sheriff Wendell Anderson and William P. Barr
Case Number: 5:2019cv05251
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY (re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byRicardo A. Vasquez Cruz. (Sanchez, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Federal Respondents' Consolidated Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Return to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed byWilliam P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Combined Reyes Exhibits)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #4 Stipulation.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Second PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13637950.). Filed by Ricardo A. Vasquez Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MPA, #2 Notice and Motion for TRO, #3 Supplement Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanchez, Laura) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez Cruz v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Valeika
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Wendell Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricardo A. Vasquez Cruz
Represented By: Laura Victoria Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?