Parziale v. HP, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Parziale
Defendant: HP, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv05363
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by J Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HP, Inc.. (Samplin, Ilissa) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 10/15/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by 30 Days Pursuant to L.R. 6-1 filed by HP, Inc. (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HP, Inc Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by HP, Inc (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilissa S. Samplin (Samplin, Ilissa) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel G. Liversidge (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Parziale.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by John Parziale OF RELATED CASE (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HP, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Summons should be filed using the correct event and not as an attachment or exhibit to another document*This fili ng will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety *Re-file as Proposed Summons*. Re:[1-2] AS TO SUMMONS ONLY, filed by John Parziale (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, HP, Inc. Filed by John Parziale. Filing Fee of $400.00 Paid, Receipt # 0971-13651699. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/27/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parziale v. HP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP, Inc
Represented By: Samuel G. Liversidge
Represented By: Ilissa S. Samplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Parziale
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?