Schneider v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Schneider
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Chino Hills Ford
Case Number: 5:2019cv05545
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob William Cutler (Cutler, Jacob) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anh X Nguyen (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chino Hills Ford identifying Other Affiliate WF Irrevocable Trust Chino Hills, Other Affiliate BW Auto Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate WF Irrevocable Trust BWAV, Other Affiliate Susan B. Walters for Chino Hills Ford. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Notice signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 19CV351991. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13671853). Filed byFord Motor Company, Chino Hills Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Ntc of Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B-Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Superior Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Answer OBO Ford, #5 Exhibit E-Answer OBO Chino Hills Ford, #6 Exhibit F-Dealer's Invoice, #7 Exhibit G-Ford's 2017 10-K Filing Excerpt, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Declaration of Counsel ISO Removal)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chino Hills Ford
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?