BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC v. LIBRATONE, INC.
Plaintiff: BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC
Defendant: LIBRATONE, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05704
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time for Defendant Libratone, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by LIBRATONE, INC.. (Davison, Thomas) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26KMOKE0.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/07/2019 filed by LIBRATONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing)(Davison, Thomas) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas W. Davison ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13768232.) filed by LIBRATONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TWD Florida certificate of good standing)(Davison, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LIBRATONE, INC... (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT LIBRATONE, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by LIBRATONE, INC.. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC. LIBRATONE, INC. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for December 18, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to LIBRATONE, INC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC.. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC . (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LIBRATONE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13691761.). Filed byBATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC v. LIBRATONE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBRATONE, INC.
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Represented By: Thomas William Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anton Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?