Dignity Health v. California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Dignity Health d/b/a Dominican Hospital and Dignity Health
Defendant: Lilia Garcia-Brower and California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement
Case Number: 5:2019cv06612
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings per #21 Order: Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 2/5/2020 to 4/29/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #20 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, as modified. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Parties' Briefing Schedule filed by Dignity Health. (Tilman, Elina) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Miles E. Locker in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCalifornia Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Lilia Garcia-Brower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to declaration in support of motion to dismiss complaint)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Locker, Miles) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Lilia Garcia-Brower. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Locker, Miles) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading, and Plaintiffs' Time to File Opposition to Anticipated 12(b)(6) Motion filed by California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. (Locker, Miles) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for February 5, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dignity Health.. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dignity Health. Lilia Garcia-Brower served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dignity Health. California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by D ignity Health, #9 Certificate of Service filed by Dignity Health (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dignity Health on Lilia Garcia-Brower (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dignity Health on California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lilia Garcia-Brower. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/ 7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dignity Health d/b/a Dominican Hospital identifying Corporate Parent CommonSpirit Health, Other Affiliate Sage Sewell for Dignity Health d/b/a Dominican Hospital. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/15/2019) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Dignity Health for Declaratory Relief and Relief Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Lilia Garcia-Brower ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13794509.). Filed byDignity Health d/b/a Dominican Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nguyen-Ruda, An) (Filed on 10/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dignity Health v. California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilia Garcia-Brower
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dignity Health d/b/a Dominican Hospital
Represented By: An H. Nguyen-Ruda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dignity Health
Represented By: An H. Nguyen-Ruda
Represented By: Elina Tilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?