Marshall v. Saul
Plaintiff: Chrystina Jean Marshall
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv06862
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Chrystina Jean Marshall. Andrew Saul served on 11/14/2019, answer due 2/12/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Jeong, In Seon) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chrystina Jean Marshall.. (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chrystina Jean Marshall of Summons/Complaint on all parties (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/22/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Chrystina Jean Marshall . (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chrystina Jean Marshall identifying Corporate Parent Chrystina Jean Marshall for Chrystina Jean Marshall. (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Chrystina Jean Marshall. (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byChrystina Jean Marshall. (Leland, Judith) (Filed on 10/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystina Jean Marshall
Represented By: Judith Smith Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?