Facebook, Inc. et al v. OnLineNic Inc et al
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC and Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited and OnLineNic Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv07071
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by January 6, 2020 filed by Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited, OnLineNic Inc. (Narancic, Perry) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Date added) Modified on 12/24/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPOINTING INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER #16 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/25/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***Posted in error, pls. disregard***CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs Facebook, Inc & Instagram, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Expert Celeste Ingalls as International Process Server filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 12/3/2019. Replies due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. OnLineNic Inc served on 11/11/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Alan Kroll for Plaintiffs Facebook, Inc. and Instragram, LLC (Kroll, Howard) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Erick Lauridsen for Plaintiffs Facebook, Inc. and Instragram, LLC (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC.. (Steele, David) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to OnLineNic Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Instagram, LLC. (Instagram, LLC's Disclosures) (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC (Facebook, Inc.'s Disclosures) (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC (Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited, OnLineNic Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13831639.). Filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 10/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. et al v. OnLineNic Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnLineNic Inc
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?