(HC) Sands v. Diaz
Petitioner: Philip Leo Sands
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 5:2019cv07169
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02125. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Philip Leo Sands. (Yin, K)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/2019 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS by Philip Leo Sands in SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (York, M)
October 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Philip Leo Sands. (Zignago, K.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Zignago, K.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Philip Leo Sands. (Zignago, K.) Modified on 10/23/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ralph Diaz by Philip Leo Sands. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Sands v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Leo Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?