Xue et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Fuyu Xue, Sissy Xue and Lenny Lau
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Perry Ford of Poway
Case Number: 5:2019cv07409
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remanded case from Santa Clara County Superior Court. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 Case Remanded to Santa Clara County Superior Court per dkt #14 Order Granting Joint Stipulation Remanding (Attachments: #1 Certified Remand Order) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #2 Certified Docket) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REMANDING CASE (granting #13 ). Case is Remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Santa Clara. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/30/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Remanding to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Santa Clara from United States District Court filed by Lenny Lau, Sissy Xue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aziz, Cinela) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Lenny Lau, Sissy Xue. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/23/2019. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Ps and As, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Order)(Aziz, Cinela) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cinela Aziz (Aziz, Cinela) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Perry Ford of Poway identifying Other Affiliate Perry Automotive Group, Inc. for Perry Ford of Poway. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 19CV356303. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13872525). Filed byPerry Ford of Poway, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Ntc of Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Original Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Ford's 2017 10-K Filing Excerpt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Removal)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xue et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen H. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Ford of Poway
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen H. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuyu Xue
Represented By: Cinela Aziz
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sissy Xue
Represented By: Cinela Aziz
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenny Lau
Represented By: Cinela Aziz
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?