The Regents of the University of Michigan v. Leica Microsystems Inc.
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Defendant: Leica Microsystems Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv07470
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #14 Stipulation.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Leica Microsystems Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Danaher Corporation for Leica Microsystems Inc.. and Certificate of Interested Entities of Persons Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time for Responding to University of Michigans Complaint filed by Leica Microsystems Inc.. (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Nora Barath (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Regents of the University of Michigan. Leica Microsystems Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 4, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Regents of the University of Michigan.. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leica Microsystems Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Regents of the University of Michigan (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Patent Infringement against Leica Microsystems Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13885562.). Filed byThe Regents of the University of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of Michigan v. Leica Microsystems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leica Microsystems Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Nora Barath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Robert F. Kramer
Represented By: Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Marc Christopher Belloli
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Represented By: Russell Steven Tonkovich
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?