Roman Salgado v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Braulio Roman Salgado
Respondent: Erik Bonnar, Chad Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr and Sheriff Wendell Anderson
Case Number: 5:2019cv07500
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Stipulated Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/13/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Status Update by Matthew T. Albence, Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Chad Wolf (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Braulio Roman Salgado. Wendell Anderson served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #10 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule. Joint status report due by 12/16/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Briefing Schedule filed by Matthew T. Albence, Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew T. Albence, Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Chad Wolf.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/10/2019 10:00 AM. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Consents/declinations to proceed before United States magistrate judge due by 12/2/2019. Return due by 12/2/2019. Traverse due by 12/5/2019. Hearing set for 12/10/2019, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/20/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sp, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Braulio Roman Salgado. Matthew T. Albence served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; William P. Barr served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; Erik Bonnar served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; Chad Wolf served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Braulio Roman Salgado.. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Immigration Detainee Habeas ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13889875.). Filed byBraulio Roman Salgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit Bond Obligor Form, #5 Exhibit IJ Bond Order, #6 Exhibit Form I-286, #7 Exhibit Bond Hearing Document List, #8 Exhibit IJ Bond Order 2, #9 Exhibit Criminal History Chart, #10 Exhibit Cancellation Document List, #11 Exhibit Braulio Declaration in Support of Cancellation, #12 Exhibit Suleima Declaration in Support of Cancellation, #13 Exhibit Dr. Ayoub Evaluation, #14 Exhibit IJ Order Granting Cancellation, #15 Exhibit BIA Receipt Notice, #16 Exhibit Motion for Bond Hearing Based on Changed Circumstances, #17 Exhibit IJ Order Denying Bond Hearing Based on Changed Circumstances, #18 Exhibit BIA appeal of Bond order, #19 Exhibit EOIR Online Status, #20 Exhibit Motion to Enforce Consent Decree, #21 Exhibit Order Denying Termination of Consent Decree, #22 Exhibit Amended Consent Decree Order, #23 Exhibit ICE Report on Yuba, #24 Exhibit News Report on Yuba, #25 Exhibit News report on Yuba, #26 Exhibit News report on Yuba, #27 Exhibit Declaration of Braulio in Support of Habeas Petition, #28 Exhibit Declaration of Suleima in Support of Habeas Petition, #29 Exhibit Psychological Effect of Deportation on Children, #30 Exhibit Ms JP Preliminary Injunction Order)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 11/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman Salgado v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erik Bonnar
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Wendell Anderson
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Braulio Roman Salgado
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?