Jackson v. Ceva Logistics et al
Plaintiff: Byron Jackson
Defendant: Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors, Tesla Motors, Ceva Logistics and Randstad Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv07657
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Remand ) filed byByron Jackson. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, In Support of Defendants Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. and Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration of Christine Woo in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration of Kiran S. Lopez in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration of Charles Grayson in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Doug Evans In Support of Defendants Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. and Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Remand ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand filed by Byron Jackson. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Byron Jackson.. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randstad Inc... (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randstad Inc... (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors re 1 Notice of Removal, Proof of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party and State Court (McAlpine, Fraser) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors re #7 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Civil Cover Sheet by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. Counsel to file and amended civil cover sheet to indicate San Jose Venue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerical error: Wrong venue. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (as, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration in Support, 1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration in Support, (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors . (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Diversity Jurisdiction) from County of Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV356275. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13911605). Filed byTesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors, Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ceva Logistics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Fraser Angus McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceva Logistics
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Fraser Angus McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad Inc.
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Lindsay Stevens Fitch
Represented By: Kiran Singh Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Jackson
Represented By: Allyssa Briana Villanueva
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?