Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. et al v. Ube, Inc.
Plaintiff: Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flex, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V., Flex, Ltd. doing business as Flextronics de Mexico and Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. doing business as Flextronics de Mexico
Defendant: Ube, Inc. and Ube, Inc. doing business as Plum, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv08351
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V., Flex, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V.. Ube, Inc. served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Flex, Ltd., Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V... (Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ube, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flex, Ltd., Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. identifying Corporate Parent Flex, Ltd. for Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flex, Ltd., Flextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. (Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Ube, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14003498). Filed byFlextronics Industrial, Ltd., Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V., Flex, Ltd., Flextronics International Europe B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- MSA, #2 Exhibit B- Arbitration Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. et al v. Ube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ube, Inc. doing business as Plum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flextronics Industrial, Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flex, Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flextronics International Europe B.V.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flex, Ltd. doing business as Flextronics de Mexico
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flextronics Manufacturing Juarez, S. de R.L. de C.V. doing business as Flextronics de Mexico
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?