Ashworth v. Azar
Plaintiff: Marleen Ashworth
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2020cv00142
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alex M. Azar, II served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Attny Gen USMS 285, #2 General Counsel USMS 285, #3 US Attny USMS 285)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marleen Ashworth. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II. Filed by Marleen Ashworth. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashworth v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marleen Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?