B.M. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B.M.
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc and G6 Hospitality LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00656
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/20 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by B.M., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 93 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/18/2020, before Judge Freeman. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #87 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 10/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2020. (Related documents(s) #87 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER STRIKING PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDERS #89 #90 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2020. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 91 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/18/2020, before Judge Freeman. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #87 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 10/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2020. (Related documents(s) #87 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 90 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order by B.M.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of her Proposed Protective Order)(Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Protective Order filed by G6 Hospitality LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order re Plaintiff's Identity, #3 Proposed Order re Commercial Information)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/20 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/20 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Choice Hotels International Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 9/22/2020)(Transcriber: Pamela Batalo Hebel). Modified on 9/22/2020 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2020.FTR Time: 10-:30 - 11:10. Plaintiff Attorney: Lori Andrus, Susanna Southworth, Erik Bauer via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Donovan, Sara Turner, Shannon Dudic, Kai Peters via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 85 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by B.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/17/2020 TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.ucourts.gov no later than September 16, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 83 STIPULATION Extending G6 Hospitality LLC's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Two Weeks Without Court Order [LR 6-1(a)] filed by G6 Hospitality LLC. (Burgess, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byB.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held for All Motions before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.'S AND CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF #32 and ECF #49 ); DENYING CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE; ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITH A PSEUDONYM; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 18, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. Order Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/30/2020. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 79 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/09/2020, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #75 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2020. (Related documents(s) #75 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/09/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Choice Hotels International Inc, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/9/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International Inc (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/09/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by B.M., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/9/2020.No Trial Dates set at this time. Further Case Management Conference to be set by Court Order.Total Time in Court: 18 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Kim Adams, Lori Andrus, Erik Bauer, Dani Pinter, Susanna Southworth via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: David Sager, Melissa Reinckens, Kai Peters, Sara Turner, Shannon Dudic via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2020 re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc.A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. Total Time in Court: 58 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Kim Adams, Lori Andrus, Erik Bauer, Dani Pinter, Susanna Southworth via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: David Sager, Melissa Reinckens, Kai Peters, Sara Turner, Shannon Dudic via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CIVIL LAW AND MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 7/9/2020 TO ZOOM WEBINAR. ***REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL IN ADVANCE IS REQUIRED, SEE BELOW*** Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearing must be done by emailing one list from each side of the names of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Wednesday, July 8 at 2:00 PM, PST. All counsel, public, and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear the proceedings but will not be able to participate in the proceedings until the Court switches them over to a participant. Before each case is called, counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance of the hearing will be converted from attendee to participant. Once the hearing ends for their case, they will be switched back to attendee. The information below is for all counsel, members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearings set on July 9, 2020, at 9:00 AM. ***All Preregistered Counsel participating in the hearing shall sign in no later than 8:50 AM for check in.*** When: July 9, 2020 at 9:00 AM PST Topic: Judge Freeman - Thursday 7/9/2020 Law and Motion / Case Management Conference Calendar Please use the link below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1607141430?pwd=OEszVGhPbTcxbjRGZngveGhmRnV5UT09Webinar ID: 160 714 1430Password: 773627 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1607141430#,,1#,773627# or +16468287666,,1607141430#,,1#,773627# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 Webinar ID: 160 714 1430 Password: 773627 International numbers available: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/u/ad2COizskYOr an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 714 1430 Password: 773627 SIP: 1607141430@sip.zoomgov.comFor more case information, please refer to the case docket at: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/cases-e-filing/cm-ecf/or the judges calendar at: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/CEO/cfd.aspx?7149or the list of all upcoming hearings at: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.
July 2, 2020 Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by B.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Burgess, Alexandra) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by B.M. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 67 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 66 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION #64 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (SUSANNA L. SOUTHWORTH). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/18/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Susanna L. Southworth ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14596433.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 63 Statement re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Peters, Kai) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byWyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE NON-CONFORMING SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) ) filed byChoice Hotels International Inc. (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byB.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) ) filed byB.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.M.. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.M.. G6 Hospitality LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.M.. Choice Hotels International Inc served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Re-File as Summons Returned Executed. Please re-file in its entirety using correct event. Re: #53 Affidavit of Serv ice filed by B.M., #52 Affidavit of Service filed by B.M., #54 Affidavit of Service filed by B.M. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. on 02/03/2020, filed by B.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on G6 Hospitality, LLC on 02/03/2020, filed by B.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Choice Hotels International, Inc. on 02/19/2020, filed by B.M.. (Avila, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #50 TO MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2020.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 50 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by B.M.. Responses due by 5/8/2020. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/24/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sara M. Turner in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Peters, Kai) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by G6 Hospitality LLC identifying Other Affiliate IBL Limited LLC for G6 Hospitality LLC. (Burgess, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 47 G6 Hospitality LLC's ANSWER to Complaint byG6 Hospitality LLC. (Burgess, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #44 TO MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International Inc and Certification of Interested Entities and Persons (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by B.M.. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION #42 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (ERIK BAUER). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/2/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Erik Bauer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14332755.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lori Erin Andrus CHRISTOPHER G. PAULOS (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #38 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE - DANI PINTER (DANIELLE MARIE BIANCULLI). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #37 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (BENJAMIN BULL). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Dani Pinter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14319946.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Bull ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14319926.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING UNRESERVED MOTION HEARING as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing reset for 7/9/2020 09:00 AM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #30 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (KATHRYN L. AVILA). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/26/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #31 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (KIMBERLY R. LAMBERT ADAMS). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/26/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/8/2020. Replies due by 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kimberly R. Lambert Adams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14315074.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kathryn Avila ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14315057.) filed by B.M.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey Claire Siegel (Siegel, Audrey) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Lee Anderson (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Erin Andrus Representing B.M. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION #25 FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (SARA M. TURNER). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/3/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Civil Local Rule 11-3) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14237269.) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Turner, Sara) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION #23 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/28/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Peters, Kai) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Sager (Sager, David) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by B.M... (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher B. Donovan. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/25/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Sager. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/25/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation Extending G6 Hospitality LLC's Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/25/20. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14213966.) filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Donovan, Christopher) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David S. Sager ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14210913.) filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Sager, David) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation Extending G6 Hospitality LLC's Deadline to Respond to Complaint [L.R. 6-2(A)] filed by G6 Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dudic, Shannon) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) to Continue Due Date for Answer or Other Response to the Complaint filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Reinckens (Reinckens, Melissa) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Choice Hotels International Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to G6 Hospitality LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by B.M. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Fi led on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 *** Proposed summonses should be e-filed separately using the appropriate events *** Proposed Summons as to defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. ONLY. (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/30/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14120655.). Filed byB.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.M. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Reinckens
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Christopher Bryan Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Inc
Represented By: Kai Peters
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Shannon E. Dudic
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Burgess
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Christopher G. Paulos
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: Audrey Claire Siegel
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Dani Pinter
Represented By: Kathryn Leigh Avila
Represented By: Benjamin Bull
Represented By: Erik Louis Bauer
Represented By: Susanna L. Southworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?