Wilmington Trust, N.A. v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 5:2020cv00660
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wilmington Trust, N.A. (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilmington Trust, N.A. re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint, (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wilmington Trust, N.A... (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Harry S. Davis. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/31/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Harry S. Davis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 097114128773.) Filing fee previously paid on 1-31-2020 filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Davis, Harry) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilmington Trust, N.A. Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilmington Trust, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation for Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF INSURANCE CONTRACT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14120914.). Filed byWilmington Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sangster, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, N.A. v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Edward Patrick Sangster
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?