Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Golden Gate Petroleum Company
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Golden Gate Petroleum Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01503
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Keeler). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14288625.) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Union Pacific Railroad Company.. (Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Golden Gate Petroleum Company. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Gate Petroleum Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14230623.). Filed byUnion Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 2/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Golden Gate Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Flesher
Represented By: Karen M. Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?