Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Zazzle Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Zazzle Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01740
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Counsel of Elina E. Kharit, Esq. from DONIGER / BURROUGHS by Minden Pictures, Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 5/20/2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Nathanael Cousins in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Counsel to appear by telephone. Case Management Conference Statement due 5/13/2020. Parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/13/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byZazzle Inc.. (Otto, Jamie) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-00996. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the convenience of parties and witnesses and in the interest of justice, the above-captioned action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant Zazzle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otto, Jamie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zazzle Inc. answer now due 3/25/2020, filed by Defendant Zazzle Inc..(Otto, Jamie)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zazzle Inc. answer now due 3/9/2020, filed by Defendants Zazzle Inc..(Attorney Jamie Otto added to party Zazzle Inc.(pty:dft))(Otto, Jamie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., upon Defendant Zazzle Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melanie A Sherk - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Doniger counsel for Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. Jonathan Ballard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Zazzle Inc. (car)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Doniger, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25230177 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Minden Pictures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Zazzle Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zazzle Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Otto
Represented By: Jamie Y. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Jonathan Oldham Ballard
Represented By: Elina E. Khairt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?