Prescott v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Prescott
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv02101
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reckitt Benckiser LLC. Filed by Steven Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Steven Robert Prescott)(Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/5/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (as to attorney Paul W. Garrity). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/1/2020.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14422980.) filed by Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Garrity, Paul) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Khirin Attila Bunker (Bunker, Khirin) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to 5/26/2020 filed by Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Suwatanapongched, Juthamas) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Suwatanapongched, Juthamas) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Juthamas Judy Suwatanapongched on behalf of defendant Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Suwatanapongched, Juthamas) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sascha Von Mende Henry on behalf of Defendant Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Eric Alfred Kafka). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2020.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven Robert Prescott ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14352527.) filed by Steven Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Prescott. Reckitt Benckiser LLC served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Prescott.. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/30/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff Steven Prescott ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14325266.) filed by Steven Prescott. (Leopold, Theodore) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Aaron Graber (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Prescott (Reichmann, Charles) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Reichmann, Charles) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reckitt Benckiser LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14316866.). Filed bySteven Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Steven Robert Prescott, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reichmann, Charles) (Filed on 3/26/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescott v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Prescott
Represented By: Charles Philip Reichmann
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Eric Alfred Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Represented By: Khirin Attila Bunker
Represented By: Juthamas Judy Suwatanapongched
Represented By: Paul W. Garrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?