Pacific Recovery Solutions et al v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MIRIAM HAMIDEH PHD CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGIST, INC., SUMMIT ESTATE INC., PACIFIC RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, BRIDGING THE GAPS, INC., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc. doing business as PCI Westlake Centers, Pacific Recovery Solutions on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Westwind Recovery and Summit Estate Inc. doing business as Summit Estate Outpatient
Defendant: VIANT, INC. and Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02251
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Related Case Order #32 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 36 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/15/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division (Unopposed) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/27/2020. Replies due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Relate Case (Unopposed) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Dmitriy G Tishyevich (Tishyevich, Dmitriy) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Warren Haskel. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Simon. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14457136.) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Haskel, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14457092.) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Simon, Joshua) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc.. Viant, Inc. served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #24 Stipulated Protective Order. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 04/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc.. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Viant, Inc... (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Carys Anne Arvidson (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING re #15 Stipulation Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/22/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Cigna shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #6 Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William Patrick Donovan, Jr (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Summit Estate Inc... (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Joy Spielman (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilienstein (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order, signed 4/15/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Lanvin.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14372627.) filed by Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Summit Estate Inc.. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc., Viant, Inc.. Filed bySummit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc.. (Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc., Viant, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded that for future filings, please do NOT enter parties' names in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc., VIANT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14338047.). Filed bySUMMIT ESTATE INC., PACIFIC RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, MIRIAM HAMIDEH PHD CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGIST, INC., BRIDGING THE GAPS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Recovery Solutions et al v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM HAMIDEH PHD CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGIST, INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMIT ESTATE INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC RECOVERY SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGING THE GAPS, INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc. doing business as PCI Westlake Centers
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Recovery Solutions on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Westwind Recovery
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Estate Inc. doing business as Summit Estate Outpatient
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.
Represented By: Carys Anne Arvidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Haskel
Represented By: Joshua B. Simon
Represented By: Dmitriy G Tishyevich
Represented By: William Patrick Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?