Johnson v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Paul David Johnson
Defendant: Ron Davis, E. Cervantes, Moody, Ronald Broomfield and H. Liu
Case Number: 5:2020cv02851
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: PSLC LLH
3 Judge: PSLC MBI
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Paul David Johnson. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
May 22, 2020 Sent Plaintiff a copy of his complaint per his request dated 5/14/20.(lmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul David Johnson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Paul David Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Reassigned due to Clerical Error. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 05/05/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 5/6/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul David Johnson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Paul David Johnson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald Broomfield, E. Cervantes, Ron Davis, H. Liu, Moody. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byPaul David Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?