The Booth Family Trust v. Dell et al
Plaintiff: The Booth Family Trust
Defendant: Patrick P. Gelsinger, Michael Brown, Karen Dykstra, Marianne Brown, Paul Sagan, Michael Dell, Zane Rowe, VMWare, Inc., Anthony Bates, Donald Carty and Egon Durban
Case Number: 5:2020cv03079
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Bates, Marianne Brown, Michael Brown, Donald Carty, Michael Dell, Egon Durban, Karen Dykstra, Patrick P. Gelsinger, Zane Rowe, Paul Sagan, VMWare, Inc.. (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthony Bates, Marianne Brown, Michael Brown, Donald Carty, Michael Dell, Egon Durban, Karen Dykstra, Patrick P. Gelsinger, Zane Rowe, Paul Sagan, VMWare, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Dell Inc., Other Affiliate Denali Intermediate Inc., Other Affiliate Dell Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate VMW Holdco LLC, Other Affiliate EMC Corporation for VMWare, Inc.. (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Alan Roethlisberger (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings RE #31 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/23/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Pavithra Rajesh in Support of #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byThe Booth Family Trust, Stacie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WeissLaw Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - GPM Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The Booth Family Trust, Stacie Williams. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/7/2020. Replies due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Katz. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark D. Smilow. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David C. Katz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14596733.) filed by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Katz, David) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mark D. Smilow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0917-14538524.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/04/2020 filed by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smilow, Mark) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice paperwork is incomplete. Please comply with our Local Rules 11-3 re: Pro Hac Vice. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #24 Renotice motion hearing, filed by The Booth Family Trust (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mark D. Smilow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14538524.) filed byThe Booth Family Trust. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Smilow, Mark) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file the application using the ECF login and password for the attorney who seeks to be admitted. Re: #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro H ac Vice for Mark D. Smilow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14538524.) filed by The Booth Family Trust (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mark D. Smilow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14538524.) filed by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv- 2182-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/13/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 21 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 20 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Booth Family Trust.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by VMWare, Inc. waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Zane Rowe waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Paul Sagan waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Karen Dykstra waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Egon Durban waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Donald Carty waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Michael Brown waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Marianne Brown waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Anthony Bates waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Patrick P. Gelsinger waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Booth Family Trust. Service waived by Michael Dell waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Booth Family Trust re #1 Complaint, (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Bates, Marianne Brown, Michael Brown, Donald Carty, Michael Dell, Egon Durban, Karen Dykstra, Patrick P. Gelsinger, Zane Rowe, Paul Sagan, VMWare, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14439282.). Filed byThe Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Booth Family Trust v. Dell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick P. Gelsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMWare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egon Durban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Booth Family Trust
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?