English v. Granite Construction Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Beau English
Defendant: Molly Campbell, David C Darnell, Jeffrey J Lyash, David H. Kelsey, James W Bradford, Jr, Granite Construction Incorporated, Jigisha Desai, Celeste B Mastin, Gaddi H. Vasquez, Alan P Krusi, Michael F McNally, Patricia D Galloway, Laurel J. Krzeminski, James Roberts and Claes G Bjork
Case Number: 5:2020cv03116
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 STIPULATED REQUEST RE STAY OF DERIVATIVE ACTION. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Stay of Derivative Action filed by Claes G Bjork, James W Bradford, Jr, Molly Campbell, David C Darnell, Jigisha Desai, Patricia D Galloway, Granite Construction Incorporated, David H. Kelsey, Alan P Krusi, Laurel J. Krzeminski, Jeffrey J Lyash, Celeste B Mastin, Michael F McNally, James Roberts, Gaddi H. Vasquez. (Phadke, Achyut) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Claes G Bjork, James W Bradford, Jr, Molly Campbell, David C Darnell, Jigisha Desai, Patricia D Galloway, Granite Construction Incorporated, David H. Kelsey, Alan P Krusi, Laurel J. Krzeminski, Jeffrey J Lyash, Celeste B Mastin, Michael F McNally, James Roberts, Gaddi H. Vasquez Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Phadke, Achyut) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Spiegel Notice of Appearance of John W. Spiegel (Spiegel, John) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fry Notice of Appearance of David H. Fry (Fry, David) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Achyut Jayant Phadke Notice of Appearance of Achyut J. Phadke (Phadke, Achyut) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings re #21 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING The Police Retirement System of St. Louis v. Granite Construction Incorporated (19-CV-04744 WHA) and English v. Granite Construction Incorporated (20-cv-03116 SVK). Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/19/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Gaddi H. Vasquez waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by James Roberts waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Michael F McNally waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Celeste B Mastin waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Jeffrey J Lyash waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Laurel J. Krzeminski waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Alan P Krusi waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by David H. Kelsey waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Granite Construction Incorporated waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Patricia D Galloway waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Jigisha Desai waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by David C Darnell waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Molly Campbell waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by James W Bradford, Jr waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beau English. Service waived by Claes G Bjork waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Claes G Bjork, James W Bradford, Jr, Molly Campbell, David C Darnell, Jigisha Desai, Patricia D Galloway, Granite Construction Incorporated, David H. Kelsey, Alan P Krusi, Laurel J. Krzeminski, Jeffrey J Lyash, Celeste B Mastin, Michael F McNally, James Roberts, Gaddi H. Vasquez. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Claes G Bjork, James W Bradford, Jr, Molly Campbell, David C Darnell, Jigisha Desai, Patricia D Galloway, Granite Construction Incorporated, David H. Kelsey, Alan P Krusi, Laurel J. Krzeminski, Jeffrey J Lyash, Celeste B Mastin, Michael F McNally, James Roberts, Gaddi H. Vasquez ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14443129.). Filed byBeau English. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Granite Construction Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J Lyash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Bradford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Construction Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jigisha Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste B Mastin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaddi H. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan P Krusi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia D Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel J. Krzeminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claes G Bjork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau English
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?