California Nurses Association v. San Jose Healthcare System, LP dba Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Plaintiff: California Nurses Association, San Jose Healthcare System, LP and Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Defendant: San Jose Healthcare System, LP doing business as Regional Healthcare Cener of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2020cv03583
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice) by California Nurses Association (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/3/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Parties are to meet and confer and respond in a joint filing by June regarding type of ADR and what deadline the Court should set for completion of ADR. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/2/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Jose Healthcare System, LP.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #12 Brief, by California Nurses Association. (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Nurses Association.. (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/ 2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff to file its reply to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to the Ex Parte Application for TRO by 6/4/2020, as ordered by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/1/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff CNA's Ex Parte Application for TRO filed bySan Jose Healthcare System, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zuzana S. Ikels as Counsel for Defendant San Jose Healthcare System, LP d/b/a Regional Medical Center of San Jose (Ikels, Zuzana) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramon Andres Miyar as Counsel for Defendant San Jose Healthcare System, LP d/b/a Regional Medical Center of San Jose (Miyar, Ramon) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Adele Fugate as Counsel for Defendant San Jose Healthcare System, LP d/b/a Regional Medical Center of San Jose (Fugate, Jeanne) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/29/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by California Nurses Association of Pending Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Nurses Association identifying Other Affiliate National Nurses United for California Nurses Association. (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Daro representing Plaintiff California Nurses Association (Daro, Nicole) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regional Medical Center of San Jose, San Jose Healthcare System, LP re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Notice (Other), #1 Notice of Removal,, (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Regional Medical Center of San Jose, San Jose Healthcare System, LP re #1 Notice of Removal,, NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT OF INTENT TO OPPOSE PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regional Medical Center of San Jose, San Jose Healthcare System, LP identifying Corporate Parent HCA Healthcare, Inc. for Regional Medical Center of San Jose, San Jose Healthcare System, LP. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441 AND 1446 (FEDERAL QUESTION JURISDICTION) from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 20cv366715. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14516260). Filed bySan Jose Healthcare System, LP, Regional Medical Center of San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Declaration)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Nurses Association v. San Jose Healthcare System, LP dba Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Nurses Association
Represented By: Nicole J. Daro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jose Healthcare System, LP
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Healthcare System, LP doing business as Regional Healthcare Cener of San Jose
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Represented By: Jeanne Adele Fugate
Represented By: Zuzana S. Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?