Hightower v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hightower, Keith Uehara, Norman Goldblatt and Sigurd Murphy
Defendant: Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd., Sky-Watcher Canada, Laurence Huen, Corey Lee, SW TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, Sky-Watcher USA, Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Joseph Lupica, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Sylvia Shen, Dave Anderson, Jean Shen and Olivon USA, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Thien Ngo and Sara Day Brewer
Case Number: 5:2020cv03639
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Granting #28 Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2020. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Granting #26 Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2020. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Rose Cole (Cole, Amy Rose) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee Nicole Lin (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Intervene and File Oppositions to: (1) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, David Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of Ca ) filed byDave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. (Henry, Amber) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara re #30 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byDaniel Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Norman Goldblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lin Y. Chan In Support of Admnistrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California ) filed byDave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sara Day Brewer, Thien Ngo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motions hearings scheduled for 8/13/2020 are HEREBY CONTINUED to 8/20/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. This notice is applicable to cases: 5:20-cv-03639-EJD, 5:20-cv-03642-EJD, and 5:20-cv-04049-EJD for Motions to Dismiss, to Transfer and Intervene. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California ) filed byDaniel Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Borden, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) and Notice of Intent to Amend the Complaint as a Matter of Course filed byDaniel Hightower. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene and File Oppositions to: (1) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, David Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California; and (2) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, Dave Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/28/2020. Replies due by 8/4/2020. (Castillo, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Hightower. Celestron Acquisition, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel Hightower. Service waived by Corey Lee waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel Hightower. Service waived by Dave Anderson waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel Hightower. Service waived by Joseph Lupica waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting #10 Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2020.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California filed by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/14/2020. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey Lee in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order)(Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/14/2020. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #10 MOTION to Relate Case by Daniel Hightower. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Daniel Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi Remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Hightower.. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Laurence Huen, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, SW TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, Jean Shen, Sylvia Shen, Sky-Watcher Canada, Sky-Watcher USA, Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/15/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14526364.). Filed byDaniel Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Huen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Lee
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lupica
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celestron Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Anderson
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hightower
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Athul Karinja Acharya
Represented By: Ronald James Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Uehara
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Goldblatt
Represented By: Lin Yee Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigurd Murphy
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Thien Ngo
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sara Day Brewer
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?