Spectrum Scientifics, LLC et al v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC, Keith Uehara and Sigurd Murphy
Defendant: Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd., Sky-Watcher Canada, Corey Lee, SW TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, Sky-Watcher USA, Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Joseph Lupica, CELESTRON ACQUISITION, LLC, Sylvia Shen, Dave Anderson, Laurence Huen, Jean Shen and Olivon USA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv03642
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Rose Cole (Cole, Amy Rose) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee Nicole Lin (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Henry (Henry, Amber) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRadio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California ) filed byDave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motions hearings scheduled for 8/13/2020 are HEREBY CONTINUED to 8/20/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. This notice is applicable to cases: 5:20-cv-03639-EJD, 5:20-cv-03642-EJD, and 5:20-cv-04049-EJD for Motions to Dismiss, to Transfer and Intervene. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California ) filed byRadio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Borden, #2 Declaration of Daniel Hightower, #3 Declaration of Dan Fish, #4 Declaration of Matt Kriebel)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) and Notice of Intent to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course filed byRadio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re:[2 5] Summons Returned Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC, #23 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC, #22 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC, #24 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. Celestron Acquisition, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. Service waived by Corey Lee waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. Service waived by Dave Anderson waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. Service waived by Joseph Lupica waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Motions {13] to Dismiss AND #14 to Transfer Case Hearing is set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Motion briefing schedule remains unchanged. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d).The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re #15 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Athul Karinja Acharya (Acharya, Athul) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gunnar Karl Martz (Martz, Gunnar) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas Noah Hagey (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Fisher (Fisher, Ronald) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Relating Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2020. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California filed by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/10/2020. Replies due by 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Corey Lee in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/10/2020. Replies due by 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC of Pendency of Related Action [Civil L.R. 3-13] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC.. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Laurence Huen, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, SW Technology Corporation, Jean Shen, Sylvia Shen, Sky-Watcher Canada, Sky-Watcher USA, Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC . (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dave Anderson, Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Laurence Huen, Corey Lee, Joseph Lupica, Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, SW Technology Corporation, Jean Shen, Sylvia Shen, Sky-Watcher Canada, Sky-Watcher USA, Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14526552). Filed by Radio City, Inc., Spectrum Scientifics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Scientifics, LLC et al v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Canada Int'l Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Lee
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lupica
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELESTRON ACQUISITION, LLC
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Anderson
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Huen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radio City, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Athul Karinja Acharya
Represented By: Ronald James Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Scientifics, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Athul Karinja Acharya
Represented By: Ronald James Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Uehara
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigurd Murphy
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?