Coburn v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Lacey Coburn
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv03817
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC Notice of Order Setting Initial CMC & ADR Deadlines (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV001367. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14564108). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration James P. Mayo, #3 Declaration Jon D. Universal, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Interested Parties, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 James P. Mayo, #7 Jon D. Universal)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coburn v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?