Murphy et al v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith Uehara and Sigurd Murphy
Defendant: Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd., Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd., SW Technology Corporation, Sky-Watcher USA, Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co. Ltd., Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd., Sky-Watcher Canada, Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd. and Olivon USA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04049
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss, Transfer and Intervene(Docket Item Nos. #15 , #16 and #22 ) and for Case 5:20-cv-03642-EJD (Docket Item Nos. #13 and 14 ) and Case 5:20-cv-04049-EJD (Docket Item No. #13 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 8/20/2020 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 8/20/2020 hearing is VACATED NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY (re #23 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed bySigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #25 Statement of Non-Opposition, by Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 Statement of Non-Opposition re #13 MOTION to Intervene and File Oppositions to: (1) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, David Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of Ca filed bySigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 Statement of Non-Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/14/2020. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A - Zapala Decl., #3 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #4 Exhibit A - Srinivasan Decl., #5 Exhibit B - Srinivasan Decl., #6 Exhibit C - Srinivasan Decl., #7 Exhibit D - Srinivasan Decl., #8 Exhibit E - Srinivasan Decl., #9 Declaration of Lin Y. Chan, #10 Exhibit A - Chan Decl., #11 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Rose Cole (Cole, Amy Rose) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee Nicole Lin (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Henry (Henry, Amber) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Intervene and File Oppositions to: (1) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, David Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of Ca ) filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara re #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 *** PLEASE SEE *** #23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified TEXT on 7/31/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motions hearings scheduled for 8/13/2020 are HEREBY CONTINUED to 8/20/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. This notice is applicable to cases: 5:20-cv-03639-EJD, 5:20-cv-03642-EJD, and 5:20-cv-04049-EJD for Motions to Dismiss, to Transfer and Intervene. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene and File Oppositions to: (1) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, David Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the Central District of California; and (2) Motion of Defendants Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corp., Corey Lee, Dave Anderson, and Joseph Lupica to Dismiss Lawsuit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/28/2020. Replies due by 8/4/2020. (Castillo, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara re #8 Summons Returned Executed (Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Sky-Watcher USA) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Keith Uehara, Sigurd Murphy. Service waived by Celestron Acquisition, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; SW Technology Corporation waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Castillo, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re #9 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Relating Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2020. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Uehara, Sigurd Murphy. Sky-Watcher USA served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara (Notice of Lodging of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related) (Attachments: #1 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #4 Exhibit A to Zapala Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Zapala Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Zapala Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Zapala Declaration)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd., Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co. Ltd., Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, SW Technology Corporation, Sky-Watcher Canada, Sky-Watcher USA, Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd., Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd., Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara . (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14593641.). Filed byKeith Uehara, Sigurd Murphy. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Celestron Acquisition, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Uehara
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigurd Murphy
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW Technology Corporation
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celestron Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?