Rubalcava v. City Of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Lionel Rubalcava
Defendant: Lieutenant Tibbet, Ron Baldal, Brian Geer, Joseph Perez, Steven Spillman, County of Santa Clara, Sergeant Hafley, Michael Brown, Ramon Avalos, Rich Torres, Edgardo Garcia, Topui Fonua, Rafael Nieves, Douglas Kaleas and City Of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2020cv04191
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (approving #26 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by County of Santa Clara, Brian Geer, Douglas Kaleas. (Schmid, Stephen) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W Pritchard for Defendant City of San Jose (Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Richard Sawyer). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2020. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14677632.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/10/2020 filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sawyer, Richard) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Notice regarding #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks of fice.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14677632.) filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14677632.) filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sawyer, Richard) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lionel Rubalcava.. (Fetrow, Kate) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Fetrow). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hoffman). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Brustin). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14638593.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/30/2020 filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fetrow, Kate) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14631298.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/29/2020 filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoffmann, Anna Benvenutti) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14631309.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/29/2020 filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brustin, Nick) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Lara Bazelon, Attorney for Plaintiff re: Admission to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: N.D. Cal. Admission)(Bazelon, Lara) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORRECTED Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #4 #5 #8 Motions for Pro Hac Vice. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***Filed in error -- please see Dkt. No. #10 *** Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #4 #5 #8 Motions for Pro Hac Vice. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) Modified on 6/30/2020 (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/30/2020 (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14638593.) filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fetrow, Kate) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings re #6 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/29/20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14631309.) filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brustin, Nick) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14631298.) filed by Lionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoffmann, Anna Benvenutti) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14621994.). Filed byLionel Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bazelon, Lara) (Filed on 6/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubalcava v. City Of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Rubalcava
Represented By: Lara Abigail Bazelon
Represented By: Nick Brustin
Represented By: Anna Benvenutti Hoffmann
Represented By: Richard W Sawyer
Represented By: Kate L Fetrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Tibbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Baldal
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Geer
Represented By: Stephen H. Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Perez
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Spillman
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Stephen H. Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Hafley
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Avalos
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Torres
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topui Fonua
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Nieves
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Kaleas
Represented By: Stephen H. Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?