Best Carpet Values, Inc. et al v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Rutledge and Best Carpet Values, Inc.
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04700
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 (Text Only) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Richard Bish for Defendant Google LLC (Bish, Dale) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Alexander H. Schmidt Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings, Inc. for Google LLC. (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S.M. Francis for Defendant Google LLC (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Jih for Defendant Google LLC (Jih, Victor) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Alexander H. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14743097.) filed by Best Carpet Values, Inc., Thomas D. Rutledge. (Schmidt, Alexander) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Best Carpet Values, Inc., Thomas D. Rutledge. Google LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Mashiri, Asil) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Best Carpet Values, Inc., Thomas D. Rutledge.. (Mashiri, Asil) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mashiri, Asil) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Statement Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification by Best Carpet Values, Inc., Thomas D. Rutledge. (Mashiri, Asil) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14690248.). Filed byBest Carpet Values, Inc., Thomas D. Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mashiri, Asil) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Carpet Values, Inc. et al v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Rutledge
Represented By: Asil A. Mashiri
Represented By: Alexander H Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Carpet Values, Inc.
Represented By: Asil A. Mashiri
Represented By: Alexander H Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Dale Richard Bish
Represented By: Victor Jih
Represented By: Jonathan S.M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?