Sanderlin et al v. City of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Cayla Sanderlin, Adira Sharkey, Breanna Contreras, Shante Thomas, Derrick Sanderlin, Joseph Stukes and Pietro diDonato
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia, Jonathan Byers, Christopher Sciba, Jason Dwyer, City of San Jose and Jared Yuen
Case Number: 5:2020cv04824
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byBreanna Contreras, Cayla Sanderlin, Derrick Sanderlin, Adira Sharkey, Joseph Stukes, Shante Thomas, Pietro diDonato. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Jonathan Byers, City of San Jose, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Christopher Sciba, Jared Yuen. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Johnson, Ardell) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #14 EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; TERMINATING #13 AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/13/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by City of San Jose. (Johnson, Ardell) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to extend the time for defendants to file a responsive pleading to complaint. filed by City of San Jose. Responses due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ardell) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adira Sharkey, Breanna Contreras, Joseph Stukes, Cayla Sanderlin, Derrick Sanderlin, Pietro diDonato, Shante Thomas. City of San Jose served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dmitry Stadlin (Stadlin, Dmitry) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re 8 . Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF Modified on 8/3/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Breanna Contreras, Cayla Sanderlin, Derrick Sanderlin, Adira Sharkey, Joseph Stukes, Shante Thomas, Pietro diDonato.. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Byers, City of San Jose, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Christopher Sciba, Jared Yuen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: Joseph Stukes and Christopher Sciba. (This is a text-only entry.) (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2020)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 7/18/2020)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14708333.). Filed byAdira Sharkey, Breanna Contreras, Cayla Sanderlin, Derrick Sanderlin, Pietro diDonato, Shante Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Certificate of No Interested Parties)(Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 7/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderlin et al v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayla Sanderlin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adira Sharkey
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Contreras
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shante Thomas
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Sanderlin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stukes
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro diDonato
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Byers
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sciba
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dwyer
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Yuen
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?