Kung v. Chex Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Defendant: Chex Systems, Inc. and Citizens Equity First Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2020cv04885
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed byCitizens Equity First Credit Union. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Shane, Jason) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 Statement of Non-Opposition re #17 MOTION for Recusal filed byCitizens Equity First Credit Union. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Shane, Jason) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, ) filed byChex Systems, Inc.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Kin Wah Kung. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed FAC, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Recusal filed by Kin Wah Kung. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/15/2020. Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Case Docket - Kung v. Experian et al.)(Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kin Wah Kung (Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Citizens Equity First Credit Union (Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Entities & Persons) (Shane, Jason) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byCitizens Equity First Credit Union. (Shane, Jason) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Chex Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent eFunds Corporation, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. for Chex Systems, Inc.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint byChex Systems, Inc.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kin Wah Kung. Citizens Equity First Credit Union served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 8/16/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kin Wah Kung. Chex Systems, Inc. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Chex Systems, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Citizens Equity First Credit Union. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kung, Kin Wah) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 (Proposed ) Order Granting #3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Kin Wah Kung. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Kin Wah Kung. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kin Wah Kung.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee paid $ 400. Receipt # 54611018470). Filed by Kin Wah Kung. Consent/Declination due by 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kung v. Chex Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chex Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kalama M. Lui-Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Equity First Credit Union
Represented By: Timothy James McCaffery
Represented By: Jason B Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?