Alghusain v. Nemeth et al
Plaintiff: Ameer Alghusain
Defendant: Ohio Department of Higher Education, Lorain County Homebuyers LLC, Ratanjit Sondhe, Joseph L Nemeth, III, John Dearborn, IGW Solutions LLC, Vinod K. Gupta, Dennis Cocco, Ohio Ethics Commission, Quicken Loans, LLC, Jason L. Nemeth, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Turnpike Commission, Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission, Thomas J Stickrath, Ohio Attorney General, GexPro Rexel USA, Inc, Mike DeWine, Edison Welding Institute, Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC and Nita Gupta
Case Number: 5:2020cv05175
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT QUICKEN LOANS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman a for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 78 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff Ameer Alghusain to Respond to Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Quicken Loans, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 76 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Department of Higher Education.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 75 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lorain County Community College.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 74 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas J Stickrath.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 73 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Ethics Commission.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 72 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Attorney General.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 71 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mike DeWine.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 70 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quicken Loans, LLC.. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE by IGW Solutions LLC (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #64 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Michael A. Walton Pro Hac Vice representing State of Ohio governor and Attorney General. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Ann Yackshaw Pro Hac Vice representing State of Ohio Governor and Attorney General. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14948284.) filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Walton)(Walton, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 63 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission.. (Mikula, Chelsea) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14947612.) filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Ann Yackshaw)(Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #58 Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion Requesting Leave to Substitute Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #55 Defendant GexPro Rexel USA, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #54 Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 13, 2020 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Defendant REXEL USA INC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
September 13, 2020 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint filed by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Martin) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Nemeth in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Rose, Martin) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ohio Ethics Commission served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Zenobia Harris Bivens Pro Hac Vice representing IGW Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14921468.) filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 9/16/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same filed by Quicken Loans, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ameer Alghusain. Service waived by Edison Welding Institute waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. IGW Solutions LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Quicken Loans, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. GexPro Rexel USA, Inc served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ohio Attorney General served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Refile as Summons Returned Executed.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #35 Certificate of Service filed by Ame er Alghusain, #37 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #41 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #36 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #42 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #34 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #39 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #43 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #40 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #38 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Edison Welding Institute by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Ohio Department of Higher Education by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Lorain County Community College by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Ohio Ethics Commission by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Thomas J. Stickrath by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Mike DeWine through Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful service on Quicken Loans LLC (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful Service on IGW Solutions LLC (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful service on Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful Service on REXEL USA Inc. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Edison Welding Institute, GexPro Rexel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDERING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. Re: Dkt. No. #3 . Mr. Alghusain must serve the complaint and summons on all defendants by 11/9/2020, or the Court may dismiss the action without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission (erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission. Service waived by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission (erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Ezeolu, Ndubisi) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint naming EWI and gexpro as defendants, and additional exhibits against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B1-B13)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Exhibit and link to Amended Complaint . Re: #26 Amended Complaint filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT Exhibits B1-B13 against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised complaint and adding new Defendants against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Edison Welding Institute and Gexpro Rexel Holdings are not named defendants in this case and th erefore no Summons can be issued. Re: #22 Proposed Summons filed by Ameer Alghusain, #23 Proposed Summons filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Ameer Alghusain re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Consent magistrate judge jurisdiction (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020)
August 8, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020)
August 8, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Vinod K. Gupta. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Joseph L Nemeth, III. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Mike DeWine. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Jason L. Nemeth. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ohio Attorney General. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to John Dearborn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ratanjit Sondhe. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ohio Ethics Commission. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Ohio Turnpike Commission. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Dennis Cocco. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Lorain County Homebuyers LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ohio Department of Higher Education. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lorain County Community College. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to IGW Solutions LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas J Stickrath. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nita Gupta. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Ameer Alghusain. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Replies due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Revised Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit U-Z)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for : 1. VIOLATIONS OF 2ND AND 14TH AMENDMENTS TO THE US CONSTITUTION; 2.DISCRIMINATION; 3.DISCRIMINATORY NEGLIGENCE 4.DISCRIMINATORY WRONGFUL EVICTION; 5. NEGLECT TO APPLY OHIO LAWS BY OHIO STATE AGENCIES against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #54611018476). Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 0A - L, #2 Exhibits M - T, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2020: #4 Filing Fee Payment Receipt) (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alghusain v. Nemeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Higher Education
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain County Homebuyers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratanjit Sondhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L Nemeth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dearborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGW Solutions LLC
Represented By: Martin Edward Rose
Represented By: Zenobia Harris Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinod K. Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Ethics Commission
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain County Community College
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Turnpike Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission
Represented By: Chelsea Royce Mikula
Represented By: Ndubisi Anthony Ezeolu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Stickrath
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Attorney General
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GexPro Rexel USA, Inc
Represented By: Martin Edward Rose
Represented By: Zenobia Harris Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Michael Allan Walton
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Welding Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nita Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameer Alghusain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?