In re: Intel Corp. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Cheryl Huang and James E. Thorsen
Defendant: Robert H. Swan, George S. Davis and Intel Corporation
Petitioner: Linda Matheson
Case Number: 5:2020cv05194
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE MEMBER CASES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING (16) STIPULATION IN CASE 5:20-cv-05194-EJD CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2020. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05194-EJD, 5:20-cv-05549-EJD, 5:20-cv-05780-EJD(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Actions and Vacating Initial Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Huang, Linda Matheson, James E. Thorsen. (Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan (Dell Angelo, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Stone Robert L. Dell Angelo and John M. Gildersleeve (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINTS (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1) filed by George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan. (Dell Angelo, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by Linda Matheson. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by Linda Matheson. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cheryl Huang. Service waived by George S. Davis waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Intel Corporation waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Robert H. Swan waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Linehan, Charles) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Cheryl Huang of Publication of SEC Class Action Notice (Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cheryl Huang re #1 Complaint (Linehan, Charles) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint by Charles Henry Linehan on behalf of Cheryl Huang (Linehan, Charles) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Linehan, Charles) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14746230.). Filed byCheryl Huang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Linehan, Charles) (Filed on 7/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Intel Corp. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Swan
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Davis
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Huang
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Thorsen
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Linda Matheson
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?