Mai v. Supercell Oy
Plaintiff: Peter Mai
Defendant: Supercell Oy
Case Number: 5:2020cv05573
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Mai. Service waived by Supercell Oy waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Mai. Supercell Oy served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Peter Mai (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/ 2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE of SUMMONS and complaint Returned Executed by Peter Mai. Supercell Oy served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Brown (Brown, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Supercell Oy. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Mai.. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Mai re #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Supercell Oy ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14802187.). Filed byPeter Mai. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mai v. Supercell Oy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mai
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Andrew J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supercell Oy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?