Ramirez v. Electronic Arts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Ramirez
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05672
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David Justin Rosen (Rosen, David) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adam Lauridsen (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by R. James Slaughter (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/6/2020.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byElectronic Arts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION #13 EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Ramirez. Electronic Arts, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 8/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Ramirez.. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Brown (Brown, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin Ramirez re #1 Complaint, (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Electronic Arts, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14813644.). Filed byKevin Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Electronic Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ramirez
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Andrew J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: David Justin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?