Jackson
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jackson
Case Number: 5:2020cv05778
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: PSLC MBI
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Juge Clerk on 09/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge, Random Reassignment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Mailing Label) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Letter dated 9/13/20 from Kenneth Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
August 27, 2020 mailed copies of re #4 clerk's notice re completion of ifp and re #5 notice of assignment to plaintiff. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re Completion of In Forma Pauperis Affidavit or Payment of Filing Fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/24/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Filing of Prisoner's Civil Rights Complaint on Form due by 9/24/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Kenneth Jackson, dated 7/22/2020 to the Honorable Jon S. Tigar regarding current visit to CSP-Solano facility. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Letter from Kenneth Jackson, dated 7/22/3030 to the Federal Oversite Panel regarding current prison issues. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?